U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-00009-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Castrellon
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 28, 2022: [Bond]
  • January 27, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 26, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 26, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • January 26, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • January 26, 2022: [Appear]
  • January 25, 2022: [Pretrial Bond Report]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order]
  • January 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 21, 2022: [Consent to Appear by VTC]
  • January 21, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 21, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.