U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00023
  • Case Name: IOM HEALTH SYSTEM, LP, d/b/a LUTHERAN HOSPITAL OF INDIANA et al v. ANTHEM INSURANCE COMPANY, INC., d/b/a ANTHEM BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Closed Dismissed]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice]
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Appear pro hac vice]
  • March 31, 2022: [Redacted Document]
  • March 31, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • March 31, 2022: [Seal a Document (Motion to Seal or Motion to Maintain Under Seal)]
  • March 31, 2022: [SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc)]
  • March 31, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 28, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • March 28, 2022: [Seal a Document (Motion to Seal or Motion to Maintain Under Seal)]
  • March 28, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 25, 2022: [MISC (Notice of Judge Assignment)]
  • March 25, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 25, 2022: [Motion (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.