U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mc-00022
  • Case Name: Central States Southeast and Southwest Areas Health and Welfare Fund v. Gemeinhardt Musical Instruments L.L.C.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release of Funds]
  • September 07, 2022: [Supplement]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Release of Funds]
  • August 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Answer to Interrogatories]
  • July 21, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 21, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Proceedings Supplemental]
  • July 15, 2022: [Proceedings Supplemental]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Pro Supp Hearing]
  • May 24, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Proceedings Supplemental]
  • April 06, 2022: [Proceedings Supplemental]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 01, 2022: [Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Registration of Foreign Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.