U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-00045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tyler Thompson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • June 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to Indict]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 26, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Consent to Appear by VTC]
  • April 20, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 20, 2022: [Pretrial Bond Report]
  • April 18, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 15, 2022: [Consent to Appear by VTC]
  • April 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 15, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order]
  • April 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.