U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-mj-00043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rippy
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 06, 2022: [Consent to Appear by VTC]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 02, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 02, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Pretrial Bond Report]
  • April 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 25, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing/Deadlines]
  • April 25, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 25, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.