U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00332-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HANSON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 05, 2023: [Extension of Time (Other)]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 14, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 07, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • September 07, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • September 06, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 13, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 03, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • April 25, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 25, 2022: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.