U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-mj-00044-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Rice
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 06, 2022: [Consent to Appear by VTC]
  • May 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 04, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 04, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 04, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • May 04, 2022: [Pretrial Bond Report]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing/Deadlines]
  • April 29, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 27, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.