U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00352-1
  • Case Name: USA v. VENABLE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 08, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 29, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 20, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • May 17, 2022: [Travel]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Complaint Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.