U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00348-1
  • Case Name: USA v. POTTS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 22, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 06, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Complaint Unsealed]
  • April 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.