U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-mj-00048-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Robinson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 09, 2022: [Pretrial Bond Report]
  • May 09, 2022: [Continue]
  • May 09, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 06, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 06, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing/Deadlines]
  • May 05, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.