U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00373-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LOWELL
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Submission]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 12, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 10, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • May 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • May 05, 2022: [Scheduling of Initial Appearance]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Readiness for Initial Appearance]
  • May 05, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 05, 2022: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.