U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00076-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Reid
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Consent to Appear by VTC]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 18, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 18, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 16, 2022: [Pretrial Bond Report]
  • May 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order]
  • May 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 13, 2022: [Continue]
  • May 13, 2022: [Detain]
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • May 12, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 12, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order]
  • May 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 11, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 06, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.