U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-mc-00014
  • Case Name: In Re Disciplinary Action Steven A Johnson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order Imposing Disciplinary Action]
  • September 02, 2022: [Reinstate Disciplined Attorney]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Mail Returned]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order Imposing Disciplinary Action]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order to Show Cause - Attorney Discipline]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order from Indiana Supreme Court Imposing Attorney Discipline]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.