U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00034
  • Case Name: IN RE: JOHNSON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Return of Service by CMRRR]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Motion (Other)]
  • August 30, 2022: [Receipt]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Return of Service by CMRRR]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order of Attorney Discipline]
  • June 06, 2022: [Return of Service by CMRRR]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order to Show Cause (Disciplinary)]
  • May 11, 2022: [MISC (Notice of Disciplinary Action)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.