U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00425-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LAWAL
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Official Transcript]
  • July 14, 2022: [Redaction Statement - Transcript (optional Case participants - doc)]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • July 11, 2022: [Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Official Transcript]
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Commitment to Another District]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 26, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 26, 2022: [0 - Docket Text Only]
  • May 25, 2022: [Motion (Other)]
  • May 19, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
  • May 16, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • May 13, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)]
  • May 13, 2022: [0 - Docket Text Only]
  • May 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.