U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00520-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MELOY-RANGEL
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 05, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 01, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 03, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 18, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 11, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 06, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • June 28, 2022: [Scheduling of Initial Appearance]
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Readiness for Initial Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.