U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00731-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CLARK
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Submission]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 15, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 06, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 29, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • August 22, 2022: [Scheduling of Initial Appearance]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Readiness for Initial Appearance]
  • August 22, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 22, 2022: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.