U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00822-1
  • Case Name: USA v. APPLEGATE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • October 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Readiness for Initial Appearance]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 06, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • September 26, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • September 22, 2022: [Scheduling of Initial Appearance]
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Readiness for Initial Appearance]
  • September 22, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 22, 2022: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.