U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00733
  • Case Name: CHEN v. NOEM et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Submission]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 23, 2025: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Reply in Support of Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 18, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement]
  • April 18, 2025: [Magistrate Judge Notice of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Submission]
  • April 17, 2025: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • April 17, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.