U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00185
  • Case Name: Garcia v. Hartson-Kennedy, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 24, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 23, 2025: [Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Hearing/Deadlines]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 18, 2025: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 18, 2025: [State Court Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.