U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-02165--11
  • Case Name: PR Madison, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Joint Administration, Order on Motion for]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Equity Security Holders, List of]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Income & Expense Statement]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Corporate Ownership Statement]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Objection Notice (must be reviewed & approved by Court before filing)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Withdraw Claim Pursuant to FRBP 3006, Motion to]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Appearance]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Minute Entry/Order Plain]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ, Application to]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Service - 341 Meeting Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Service - Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Service - Order (All Creditors)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Notice (must be reviewed & approved by Court before filing)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [341 Meeting Notice - Ch 11]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Transfer Order re: Judge, District, or Division]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Notice - Petition]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Corrective Entry-Case Information]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Appearance]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Joint Administration, Motion for]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.