U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00337
  • Case Name: Mehrdad v. Homeland Security et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 24, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Certificate]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 21, 2025: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • April 21, 2025: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 21, 2025: [Certificate]
  • April 21, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.