U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00028
  • Case Name: Hu et al v. Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 27, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 25, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Hearing/Deadlines]
  • April 21, 2025: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • April 21, 2025: [Proposed Summons]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.