U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-02344--7
  • Case Name: David Ray McIntyre
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jacobson, Christine Kaye [BNC Certificate of Service - Notice]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jacobson, Christine Kaye [BNC Certificate of Service - 341 Meeting Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jacobson, Christine Kaye [Deficiency Notice - Petition]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jacobson, Christine Kaye [341 Meeting of Creditors (Ch 7 No Asset Individual)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jacobson, Christine Kaye [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jacobson, Christine Kaye [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jacobson, Christine Kaye [Ch 7 Statement of Current Monthly Income/Statement of Exemption (Form 122A-1 and 122A-1Supp)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jacobson, Christine Kaye [Pay Advices and/or Statement in Lieu of Pay Advices]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jacobson, Christine Kaye [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jacobson, Christine Kaye [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.