U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-80179--13
  • Case Name: Richard Michael Carrar and Patty Jo Carrar
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [Request for Notice]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [BNC Certificate of Service - 341 Meeting Notice]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [Certificate of Service re: Plan Notice (Ch 13 Only)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [BNC Certificate of Service - Notice]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [Plan Notice - Debtor or Trustee Distribution (Ch 13)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [341 Meeting of Creditors (Ch 13)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [Hearing Notice on Motion to Impose/Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [Prior Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [Affidavit]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [Extend Automatic Stay Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 362(c)(3)(B), Motion to]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [Chapter 13 Plan - Original/Corrected Original]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1)]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [Pay Advices and/or Statement in Lieu of Pay Advices]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hauber, John Morgan [Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.