U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-80180--7
  • Case Name: Wyiatt Reed Heckelsberg and Kiersten Renee Heckelsberg
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marocco, Lou Ann [Relief from Stay, Motion for]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marocco, Lou Ann [Abandon, Motion to]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marocco, Lou Ann [Appearance]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marocco, Lou Ann [BNC Certificate of Service - 341 Meeting Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marocco, Lou Ann [BNC Certificate of Service - Notice]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marocco, Lou Ann [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marocco, Lou Ann [341 Meeting of Creditors (Ch 7 No Asset Individual)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marocco, Lou Ann [Deficiency Notice - Petition]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marocco, Lou Ann [Pay Advices and/or Statement in Lieu of Pay Advices]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marocco, Lou Ann [Certificate of Debtor Education]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marocco, Lou Ann [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marocco, Lou Ann [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marocco, Lou Ann [Ch 7 Statement of Current Monthly Income/Statement of Exemption (Form 122A-1 and 122A-1Supp)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marocco, Lou Ann [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.