U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-01746-7
  • Case Name: Raymond Roger Letts
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neiman, Donald F [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Discharging Debtor]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neiman, Donald F [Final Decree-Chapter 7]
  • November 29, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neiman, Donald F [Close Case - Bankruptcy]
  • November 29, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neiman, Donald F [Order of Discharge Chapter 7]
  • November 15, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neiman, Donald F [Corrective Entry]
  • November 15, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neiman, Donald F [Debtor's Financial Management Course Certificate and/or Official Form 423]
  • November 14, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neiman, Donald F [Debtor's Financial Management Course Certificate and/or Official Form 423]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neiman, Donald F [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 22, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neiman, Donald F [Notice of Deficient Financial Management Course]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neiman, Donald F. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (Module)]
  • September 21, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neiman, Donald F. [Notice Request]
  • September 02, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neiman, Donald F. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 02, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neiman, Donald F. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 01, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neiman, Donald F. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings - AutoDocket]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neiman, Donald F. [Order RE: Duties of Debtors - Chp 7]
  • August 31, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neiman, Donald F. [341 Meeting - Ch7 -No Asset-Ind]
  • August 31, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neiman, Donald F. [none]
  • August 31, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [none]
  • August 31, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neiman, Donald F. [Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption from Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • August 31, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neiman, Donald F. [Debtor Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
  • August 31, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neiman, Donald F. [Employee Income Record]
  • August 31, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption from Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • August 31, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Debtor Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
  • August 31, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Record]
  • August 31, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neiman, Donald F. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7]
  • August 31, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.