U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-mj-00121-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hicks, Jr. et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 12, 2017: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision]
  • September 11, 2017: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
  • September 08, 2017: [Transcript]
  • September 07, 2017: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
  • September 06, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • September 06, 2017: [Detention]
  • September 06, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 06, 2017: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 01, 2017: [Miscellaneous Hearing (set/reset hearing only)]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Warrant of Arrest Returned Executed]
  • August 29, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 28, 2017: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • August 28, 2017: [Detention]
  • August 28, 2017: [Appointing Public Defender or CJA Panel Attorney]
  • August 28, 2017: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit (Sealed)]
  • August 28, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 28, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 28, 2017: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.