U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-mj-00436-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Valles
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • September 18, 2017: [Detention]
  • September 18, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 12, 2017: [Continue]
  • September 12, 2017: [Continue Hearing]
  • September 12, 2017: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 12, 2017: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • September 07, 2017: [Notice - Other]
  • September 07, 2017: [Detention]
  • September 07, 2017: [Appointing Public Defender or CJA Panel Attorney]
  • September 07, 2017: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit (Sealed)]
  • September 07, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 07, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 07, 2017: [Warrant of Arrest Returned Executed]
  • September 07, 2017: [Arrest]
  • September 07, 2017: [Interpreter Needed]
  • September 07, 2017: [Complaint]
  • September 07, 2017: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 07, 2017: [Notice - Related Case]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.