U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-mj-00464-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Weckman et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • October 02, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • September 29, 2017: [Conditions of Release]
  • September 29, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 29, 2017: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 29, 2017: [Detention]
  • September 29, 2017: [Notice - Other]
  • September 29, 2017: [Appointing Public Defender or CJA Panel Attorney]
  • September 29, 2017: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit (Sealed)]
  • September 29, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 28, 2017: [Warrant of Arrest Returned Executed]
  • September 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 27, 2017: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • September 27, 2017: [Detention]
  • September 27, 2017: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit (Sealed)]
  • September 27, 2017: [Appointing Public Defender or CJA Panel Attorney]
  • September 27, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 27, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 27, 2017: [Order]
  • September 27, 2017: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.