U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-mj-00463-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Washington
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Transcript]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • October 03, 2017: [Detention]
  • October 03, 2017: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 03, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 02, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Detention]
  • September 29, 2017: [Notice - Other]
  • September 29, 2017: [Appointing Public Defender or CJA Panel Attorney]
  • September 29, 2017: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit (Sealed)]
  • September 29, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 29, 2017: [Warrant of Arrest Returned Executed]
  • September 29, 2017: [Arrest]
  • September 29, 2017: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.