U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-mj-00131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Graves
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • November 02, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • November 02, 2017: [Conditions of Release]
  • November 02, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 26, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 25, 2017: [Order]
  • October 25, 2017: [Conditions of Release]
  • October 25, 2017: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit (Sealed)]
  • October 25, 2017: [Rule 5.c.3 Documents Received]
  • October 25, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 25, 2017: [Arrest - Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.