U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-mj-00522-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Suarez Suarez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • November 03, 2017: [Warrant of Arrest Returned Executed]
  • November 02, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 01, 2017: [Waiver - Other]
  • November 01, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 01, 2017: [Detention]
  • November 01, 2017: [Appointing Public Defender or CJA Panel Attorney]
  • November 01, 2017: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit (Sealed)]
  • November 01, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order]
  • November 01, 2017: [Arrest]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Interpreter Needed]
  • October 31, 2017: [Complaint]
  • October 31, 2017: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 31, 2017: [Notice - Related Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.