U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-mj-00130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Overton
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • November 07, 2017: [Detention]
  • November 07, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 07, 2017: [Miscellaneous Hearing (set/reset hearing only)]
  • November 06, 2017: [Rule 5.c.3 Documents Received]
  • November 03, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 02, 2017: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • November 02, 2017: [Detention]
  • November 02, 2017: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit (Sealed)]
  • November 02, 2017: [Appointing Public Defender or CJA Panel Attorney]
  • November 02, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 02, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 02, 2017: [Arrest]
  • November 02, 2017: [Arrest - Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.