U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-mj-00141-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pugh
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Detention]
  • November 29, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 27, 2017: [Miscellaneous Hearing (set/reset hearing only)]
  • November 27, 2017: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 21, 2017: [Continue]
  • November 21, 2017: [Continue Hearing]
  • November 21, 2017: [Miscellaneous Hearing (set/reset hearing only)]
  • November 20, 2017: [Order]
  • November 17, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 17, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 17, 2017: [Appointing Public Defender or CJA Panel Attorney]
  • November 17, 2017: [Detention]
  • November 17, 2017: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit (Sealed)]
  • November 17, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 17, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 17, 2017: [Arrest]
  • November 16, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.