U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-mj-00566-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rattray
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • December 12, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 12, 2017: [Detention]
  • December 05, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 05, 2017: [Continue Hearing]
  • December 05, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order]
  • December 04, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 04, 2017: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • December 01, 2017: [Detention]
  • December 01, 2017: [Notice - Other]
  • December 01, 2017: [Appointing Public Defender or CJA Panel Attorney]
  • December 01, 2017: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit (Sealed)]
  • December 01, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 01, 2017: [Warrant of Arrest Returned Executed]
  • December 01, 2017: [Order]
  • December 01, 2017: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.