U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-mj-00148-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ivey
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • December 06, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • December 06, 2017: [Detention]
  • December 06, 2017: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 06, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 05, 2017: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • December 05, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 04, 2017: [Warrant of Arrest Returned Executed]
  • December 04, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 01, 2017: [Detention]
  • December 01, 2017: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit (Sealed)]
  • December 01, 2017: [Appointing Public Defender or CJA Panel Attorney]
  • December 01, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 01, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 01, 2017: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.