U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-mj-00579-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez Carranza
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • December 18, 2017: [Waiver (terminated cases)]
  • December 15, 2017: [Warrant of Arrest Returned Executed]
  • December 15, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 13, 2017: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • December 12, 2017: [Detention]
  • December 12, 2017: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit (Sealed)]
  • December 12, 2017: [Appointing Public Defender or CJA Panel Attorney]
  • December 12, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 12, 2017: [Order]
  • December 12, 2017: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.