U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-mj-00155-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Colman et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • January 02, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 02, 2018: [Detention]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 27, 2017: [Waiver - Other]
  • December 27, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 19, 2017: [Warrant of Arrest Returned Executed]
  • December 19, 2017: [Detention]
  • December 19, 2017: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit (Sealed)]
  • December 19, 2017: [Appointing Public Defender or CJA Panel Attorney]
  • December 19, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 19, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 19, 2017: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.