U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-mj-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • February 14, 2018: [Interpreter Needed]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Response in Opposition/Resistance (Seal doc optional)]
  • January 25, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • January 24, 2018: [Brief - Other]
  • January 18, 2018: [Transcript]
  • January 17, 2018: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
  • January 17, 2018: [Stay]
  • January 17, 2018: [Detention]
  • January 17, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 17, 2018: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 16, 2018: [Order]
  • January 12, 2018: [Detention]
  • January 12, 2018: [Appointing Public Defender or CJA Panel Attorney]
  • January 12, 2018: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit (Sealed)]
  • January 12, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 12, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 12, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2018: [Complaint]
  • January 12, 2018: [Arrest]
  • January 12, 2018: [Notice - Related Case]
  • January 12, 2018: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.