U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-mj-00038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gutierrez Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Detention]
  • January 24, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 24, 2018: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 22, 2018: [Warrant of Arrest Returned Executed]
  • January 22, 2018: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • January 19, 2018: [Detention]
  • January 19, 2018: [Notice - Other]
  • January 19, 2018: [Appointing Public Defender or CJA Panel Attorney]
  • January 19, 2018: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit (Sealed)]
  • January 19, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 19, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order]
  • January 19, 2018: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.