U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-mj-00069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Green
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • February 15, 2018: [Report/Order on Pretrial Supervision]
  • February 12, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • February 12, 2018: [Detention]
  • February 12, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 12, 2018: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 08, 2018: [Detention]
  • February 08, 2018: [Appointing Public Defender or CJA Panel Attorney]
  • February 08, 2018: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit (Sealed)]
  • February 08, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 08, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 08, 2018: [Warrant of Arrest Returned Executed]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order]
  • February 08, 2018: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.