U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-mc-00005
  • Case Name: Oil-Dri Corporation of America et al v. Nestle Purina PetCare Company
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Terminate Civil Case]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Compel]
  • April 03, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Reply]
  • March 28, 2018: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • March 26, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 23, 2018: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 23, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 12, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • March 09, 2018: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • March 09, 2018: [Compel]
  • March 09, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 09, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • March 09, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 08, 2018: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.