U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-mj-00143-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lee
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 03, 2018: [Release from Custody]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • March 20, 2018: [Detention]
  • March 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 19, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 19, 2018: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit (Sealed)]
  • March 19, 2018: [Waiver - Other]
  • March 13, 2018: [Order]
  • March 13, 2018: [Detention]
  • March 13, 2018: [Appointing Public Defender or CJA Panel Attorney]
  • March 13, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.