U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-mj-00197-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Adame
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • April 10, 2018: [Detention]
  • April 10, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 10, 2018: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 04, 2018: [Stipulated Discovery and Protective Order]
  • April 04, 2018: [Proposed Stipulated Discovery and Protective Order]
  • April 03, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 03, 2018: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • April 03, 2018: [Warrant of Arrest Returned Executed]
  • April 02, 2018: [Detention]
  • April 02, 2018: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit (Sealed)]
  • April 02, 2018: [Appointing Public Defender or CJA Panel Attorney]
  • April 02, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 02, 2018: [Order]
  • April 02, 2018: [Arrest]
  • April 02, 2018: [Complaint]
  • April 02, 2018: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 02, 2018: [Notice - Related Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.