U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-mj-00251-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wright
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice - Other]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • May 23, 2018: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • May 17, 2018: [Exhibits Scanned LR LCrR 57B]
  • May 16, 2018: [Detention]
  • May 16, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 16, 2018: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 11, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 10, 2018: [Warrant of Arrest Returned Executed]
  • May 10, 2018: [Detention]
  • May 10, 2018: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit (Sealed)]
  • May 10, 2018: [Appointing Public Defender or CJA Panel Attorney]
  • May 10, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 10, 2018: [Arrest]
  • May 10, 2018: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.