U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-mj-00050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Urizar Lopez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • June 19, 2018: [Detention]
  • June 08, 2018: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 08, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 07, 2018: [Notice - Other]
  • June 06, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 05, 2018: [Warrant of Arrest Returned Executed]
  • June 05, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 04, 2018: [Continue]
  • June 04, 2018: [Continue Hearing]
  • June 04, 2018: [Detention]
  • June 04, 2018: [Notice - Other]
  • June 04, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 04, 2018: [Interpreter Needed]
  • June 04, 2018: [Arrest]
  • June 04, 2018: [Complaint]
  • June 04, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 04, 2018: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.