U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-mj-00325-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hodgkiss
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • June 27, 2018: [Detention]
  • June 22, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 22, 2018: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 21, 2018: [Warrant of Arrest Returned Executed]
  • June 20, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 19, 2018: [Detention]
  • June 19, 2018: [Appointing Public Defender or CJA Panel Attorney]
  • June 19, 2018: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit (Sealed)]
  • June 19, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order]
  • June 19, 2018: [Arrest]
  • June 19, 2018: [Complaint]
  • June 19, 2018: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.