open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa
    Case Number:5:18-cv-04089
    Party Name:MCI Communications Services Inc v. Rognes Corp, et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [UNRESISTED Motion]
    Date Published:April 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.iand.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?53390
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =