U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cv-03073
  • Case Name: Garrison v. New Fashion Pork LLP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [New Trial]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • February 07, 2020: [Strike]
  • February 07, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • January 24, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • January 10, 2020: [Strike]
  • January 03, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • January 03, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Protective Order]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • November 21, 2019: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • November 21, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • November 08, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 01, 2019: [Continue Trial]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • August 15, 2019: [Strike]
  • August 05, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 05, 2019: [Strike]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 02, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [More Definite Statement]
  • February 26, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • February 26, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.